CO SJR015 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Senate Third Reading Reconsidered
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Senate Third Reading Reconsidered
Summary
GA Opposition To Fed Traffic Sign Regul
Title
GA Opposition To Fed Traffic Sign Regul
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-015, as amended, to the full Senate (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-015, as amended, to the full Senate (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-015, as amended, to the full Senate (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-015, as amended, to the full Senate (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-015, as amended, to the full Senate (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Committee on Transportation Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |