CO SJM001 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-15)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-15)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing Senator Martha Ezzard.
Title
Memorializing Senator Martha Ezzard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: MEMORIALS Mem (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/07/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |