CO SCR004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Submitting to the registered electors of the state of Colorado an amendment to the Colorado constitution concerning a change to the way that congressional districts are drawn, and, in connection therewith, taking the duty to draw congressional districts away from the state legislature and giving it to an independent commission, composed of twelve citizens who possess specified qualifications; prohibiting any one political party's control of the commission by requiring that one-third of commissioners will not be affiliated with any political party, one-third of the commissioners will be affiliated with the state's largest political party, and one-third of the commissioners will be affiliated with the state's second largest political party; prohibiting certain persons, including professional lobbyists, federal campaign committee employees, and federal, state, and local elected officials, from serving on the commission; limiting judicial review of a map to a determination by the supreme court of whether the commission or its nonpartisan staff committed an abuse of discretion; requiring the commission to draw districts with a focus on communities of interest and political subdivisions, such as cities and counties, and then to maximize the number of competitive congressional seats to the extent possible; and prohibiting maps from being drawn to dilute the electoral influence of any racial or ethnic group or to protect any incumbent, any political candidate, or any political party.
Title
Congressional Redistricting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Cncrnt Res (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer SCR18-004 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Legislative Council |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |