CO SB095 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the employment first advisory partnership, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendation contained in the 2020 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies and creating a hiring preference pilot program for people with disabilities.
Title
Sunset Employment First Advisory Partnership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-095 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 21-095 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-095 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-095 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 21-095 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-095 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |