CO SB295 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
concerning fraud in the medicaid program.
Title
Revise Medicaid Fraud Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-295 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-295 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-295 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-295 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |