CO SB293 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning property taxation, and, in connection therewith, establishing subclasses of residential and nonresidential property; for the 2022 and 2023 property tax years, temporarily reducing the assessment rate for property classified as agricultural property or renewable energy production property from twenty-nine percent to twenty-six and four-tenths percent, for property classified as multi-family residential real property from seven and fifteen one-hundredths percent to six and eight-tenths percent, contingent on the assessment rate not otherwise being reduced by an initiated measure, and for all other residential real property from seven and fifteen one-hundredths percent to six and ninety-five one-hundredths percent; restructuring the assessment rate laws; expanding the property tax deferral program to allow taxpayers to defer increases in property taxes in limited circumstances; and making an appropriation.
Title
Property Tax Classification And Assessment Rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-293 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.021) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.020) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.019) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-293, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-293, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-293 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.021) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.020) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.019) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-293, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-293, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |