CO SB292 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning labor requirements for energy sector construction, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Labor Requirements For Energy Sector Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-292 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-292 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-292, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-292 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-292 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-292, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-03 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |