CO SB288 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the "American Rescue Plan Act of 2021" cash fund to hold money that the state receives from the federal coronavirus state fiscal recovery fund until allocation by separate action.
Title
American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-288 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-288 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-288 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-288 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |