CO SB279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarification of the applicability provisions of recent legislation to promote an equitable financial contribution among affected public bodies in connection with urban redevelopment projects allocating tax revenues.
Title
Applicability Recent Urban Renewal Legislation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |