CO SB263 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a pilot program to allow for court approval of treatment medications in jails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pilot Program Court Approval Treatment Medications In Jails

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-263 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-263 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
2018-05-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2018-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-30SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-263
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_263_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_263_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_263_rn2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-30t143845z-sb18-263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-263vote07e8e9
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-30t143845z-sb18-263-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-30t143845z-sb18-263-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-05-08t135141z-sb18-263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-05-08t135141z-sb18-263-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-05-08t135141z-sb18-263-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-05-08t135141z-sb18-263-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback