CO SB262 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt Enrolled Agents From Debt-Mgmt Services
Title
Exempt Enrolled Agents From Debt-Mgmt Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |