CO SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to address prison population management issues, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the emergency use of the Centennial south campus of the Centennial correctional facility to house inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use CSP II To House Inmates In An Emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Joint - CC_SB19-259_2019A: Adopt the First Report of the First Conference Committee on SB 19-259, CLSB259.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Amend amendment L.003, page 1, line 16, strike "Article 17.5" and substitute "Article 27.5" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-03SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-05-03HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-05-03 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-259
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_259_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_259_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_259_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_259_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_259_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_259_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/267bf2a42cd9b410872583e7000c125c-sb19-259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote670ceb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4fca6410e903c3b7872583ec007658e1-sb19-259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote743e1e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote7ce451
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote7cd231
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote7bc791
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote7639ad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote7bb442
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-259vote6953c0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/267bf2a42cd9b410872583e7000c125c-sb19-259-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4fca6410e903c3b7872583ec007658e1-sb19-259-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4fca6410e903c3b7872583ec007658e1-sb19-259-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4fca6410e903c3b7872583ec007658e1-sb19-259-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a1c8869b6d1253872583ef0076b595-sb19-259-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback