CO SB259 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the taxation of retail marijuana by local governments, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Retail Marijuana Taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - CC_SB18-259_2018A: Motion to approve the report of the first conference committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-259 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 18-259 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment H]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment I]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment G]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-259, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment J]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 [Attachment L]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 [Attachment K]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-259, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06 Governor Signed
2018-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-09SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2018-05-09HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2018-05-09 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-05-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2018 - No Amendments
2018-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-04-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
2018-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-259
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_259_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_259_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_259_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_259_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_259_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_259_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-24t140458z-sb18-259-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-26t090323z-sb18-259-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-26t090323z-sb18-259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-259vote5a3abc
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hlg2018a2018-05-02t133526z-sb18-259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-04t080944z-sb18-259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-259vote56d005
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-259vote0c8f11
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-259vote13efb6
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-259vote04fc35
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-259vote051719
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-259vote13ff71
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ccsb18-2592018a2018-05-09t141821z-sb18-259-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback