CO SB256 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

concerning electronic documents related to the ownership of a vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Documents Motor Vehicle Appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-256 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-256 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-256
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_256_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_256_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_256_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_256_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_256_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_256_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d6d6409f31019c6b872583e5004d97c8-sb19-256-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-256vote58bbca
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3b82c4d9608cd843872583ed004fa041-sb19-256-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-256vote5740d6

Bill Comments

feedback