CO SB245 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-21)
Status: Passed on June 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning backcountry search and rescue services in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Backcountry Search And Rescue In Colorado

Sponsors

Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Perry Will [R]
Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Rep. Marc Catlin [R]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]
Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. Donald Coram [R]
Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]
Sen. Bob Gardner [R]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Holbert [R]
Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]
Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]Sen. Kevin Priola [R]
Sen. Ray Scott [R]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]Sen. Jerry Sonnenberg [R]
Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]
Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]
Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]
Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Edith Hooton [D]
Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Susan Lontine [D]
Rep. Michael Lynch [R]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]Rep. Hugh McKean [R]Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]
Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]
Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]
Rep. Donald Valdez [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Dave Williams [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-245 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-245, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-245, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-27 Governor Signed
2021-06-16 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
2021-05-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-21SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-12SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-245
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_245_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_245_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_245_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_245_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_245_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_245_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB245_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB245_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB245_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb245_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb245_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0245_sn2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb245_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0245_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/17cc1af0102f87c6872586d30072e893-sb21-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2b0addf5db5e1f61872586dc004f6209-sb21-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2b0addf5db5e1f61872586dc004f6209-sb21-245-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-245vote5c2bef
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/347ea3c72981ca3f872586e3000b382d-sb21-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c451cca2a226286f872586e7004f93ae-sb21-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c451cca2a226286f872586e7004f93ae-sb21-245-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/17cc1af0102f87c6872586d30072e893-sb21-245-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-245vote6ffd2f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-245vote0f9274
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-245vote0f9f7f

Bill Comments 750

feedback