CO SB245 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

concerning the disposal of naturally occurring radioactive materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Natural Occurring Radioactive Material Rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-245 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-245 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06 Governor Signed
2018-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-05-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
2018-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-245
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_245_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_245_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_245_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_245_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_245_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_245_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-04-26t133512z-sb18-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-245vote086f4f
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-245vote08dcdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-05-07t131704z-sb18-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-245vote56fdd5

Bill Comments

feedback