CO SB238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the front range passenger rail district, and, in connection therewith, creating the district for the purpose of planning, designing, developing, financing, constructing, operating, and maintaining a passenger rail system, specifying the territory, governing structure, powers, and duties of the district, and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Create Front Range Passenger Rail District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.021) (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.018 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.014) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.021) (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.018 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.014) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |