CO SB235 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning county administration of public assistance programs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
County Administration Of Public Assistance Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |