CO SB234 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning creation of the agriculture and drought resiliency fund, and, in connection therewith, transferring money from the general fund to the fund and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Fund Transfer Agriculture And Drought Resiliency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-234 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-234 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-234 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Governor Signed
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
2021-05-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-21SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-13SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-234
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_234_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_234_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_234_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_234_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_234_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_234_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB234_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB234_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb234_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0234_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/88ac5ef7ff437031872586d40070c8aa-sb21-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7f6acd16949a836d872586dc004f0a78-sb21-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-234vote5c2be7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0c0fb1fb81880d97872586e2006811ce-sb21-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82ede80c8f62defc872586e7004f2915-sb21-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-234vote711078

Bill Comments 750

feedback