CO SB225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repayment of cash funds from which money was transferred in 2020 for the purpose of augmenting the general fund.
Title
Repay Cash Funds For 2020 Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-225 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-225 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-225 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-225 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |