CO SB221 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning banning the use of a panic defense unless a party can show its relevance to the court.
Title
Gay Panic Or Transgender Panic Defense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |