CO SB219 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rates a motor vehicle dealer charges a motor vehicle manufacturer for work performed by the dealer in accordance with a warranty obligation.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealer And Manufacturer Service Rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.020 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.020 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-219, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-05-01 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |