CO SB214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-7)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-7)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state payments to licensed hospice facilities for residential care provided to certain persons enrolled in the medical assistance program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
State Payment Hospice Providers Residential Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-214 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-214 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-214 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-214 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |