CO SB206 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning resources for disaster preparedness and recovery, and, in connection therewith, creating the disaster resilience rebuilding program, the sustainable rebuilding program, the office of climate preparedness, and making an appropriation.
Title
Disaster Preparedness And Recovery Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M) to L.006. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment L). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment K). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I), as amended. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M) to L.006. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment L). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment K). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I), as amended. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |