CO SB205 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning consumer protections in interactions with artificial intelligence systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protections for Artificial Intelligence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.014) (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 21 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H). (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.005) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2024-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2024-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2024-05-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2024-05-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2024-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2024-05-04HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2024-05-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
2024-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2024-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2024-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/02/2024 - No Amendments
2024-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2024 - No Amendments
2024-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2024 - No Amendments
2024-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2024-04-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb24-205
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_205_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_205_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_205_rn4.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_205_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_205_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_205_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/630E6A5B85C5813787258B090071831B/SB205_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/02D38DCB201A592787258B10007741C2/SB205_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/BBE0DE9A3F0D758387258B12005AAAC6/SB205_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/B3A78A93F3CB5B3587258B130080CF70/SB205_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/B34A507705B4629C87258B13007417ED/SB205_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/4FA74C1FDA209F3487258B16007698E4/SB205_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/6B2F8EF9CF1CC34887258B150074F070/SB205_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/7E27D5CA8102FBBA87258B150056AB14/SB205_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2024A/amendments/44D0A453DD3FA93687258B1700583AA7/SB205_L.014.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/fn/2024a_sb205_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/fn/2024a_sb205_r1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/546a1fde4658bec687258b09007dbebd-sb24-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/546a1fde4658bec687258b09007dbebd-sb24-205-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote570de9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote578fd7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/976ef23cc48177d487258b140001196a-sb24-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/976ef23cc48177d487258b140001196a-sb24-205-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/976ef23cc48177d487258b140001196a-sb24-205-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote0f89fd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote62bf5b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote62d4b7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote62a58b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote068935
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb24-205vote069981

Bill Comments

feedback