CO SB205 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the regulation of industrial hemp as an agricultural product, and, in connection therewith, identifying the unprocessed seeds of industrial hemp as a commodity under the "Commodity Handler Act" and industrial hemp as a farm product under the "Farm Products Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Hemp Designation Agricultural Product

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-205 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-205 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Governor Signed
2018-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
2018-03-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-205
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_205_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_205_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_205_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_205_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_205_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_205_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-03-22t133010z-sb18-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-205vote5abe14
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-23t133246z-sb18-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-205vote57c8f3
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-205vote68d682
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-205vote68bce7

Bill Comments

feedback