CO SB196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning supporting the health needs of persons who may be involved with the criminal justice system, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Health Needs Of Persons In Criminal Justice System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Joint - CC_SB22-196_2022A: Adopt CLSB196.002, including language clarifying nonprofit hospital eligibility for grants (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Joint - CC_SB22-196_2022A: Adopt CLSB196.002 with the inclusion of withdrawal management provisions (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Joint - CC_SB22-196_2022A: Adopt CLSB196.002 with a technical change to the appropriations clause (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 severed section B. (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 severed section A, consisting of lines 1-3 and 8-19 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Joint - CC_SB22-196_2022A: Adopt CLSB196.002, including language clarifying nonprofit hospital eligibility for grants (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Joint - CC_SB22-196_2022A: Adopt CLSB196.002 with the inclusion of withdrawal management provisions (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Joint - CC_SB22-196_2022A: Adopt CLSB196.002 with a technical change to the appropriations clause (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 severed section B. (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 severed section A, consisting of lines 1-3 and 8-19 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2022-05-11 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2022-05-10 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-03 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |