CO SB196 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum Speeds Interstate 70
Title
Minimum Speeds Interstate 70
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to a substitute motion to refer Senate Bill 10-196 to the Committee of the Whole. The substitute motion passed on a 10-0 roll call vote. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-196 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-196 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-10 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations |