CO SB187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Review Mental Hlth Professionals
Title
Sunset Review Mental Hlth Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-187, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-09 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-06 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-05 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-05 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment + Appropriations | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Finance | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Finance + Appropriations |