CO SB183 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Prohib On Medical Balance Billing
Title
Extend Prohib On Medical Balance Billing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-183 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-183 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-183 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-29 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-27 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-22 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-15 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |