CO SB180 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning programs to reduce ground level ozone through increased use of transit.
Title
Programs To Reduce Ozone Through Increased Transit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-180 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 22-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 22-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-180 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-180 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 22-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 22-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 22-180 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |