CO SB176 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding of work required for early stage front range passenger rail corridor development.
Title
Early Stage Front Range Passenger Rail Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-176 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-20 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |