CO SB176 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to facilitate enforcement of existing prohibitions against unreasonable conduct by health insurers.
Title
Protect Neutral Determinations In Health Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-176 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-176 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |