CO SB174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tuition assistance eligibility for dependent children of certain persons, and, in connection therewith, determining eligibility for dependents of prisoners of war, military personnel missing in action, National Guardsmen, law enforcement officers, and firefighters.
Title
Dependent Tuition Assistance Program Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-174 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-174 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |