CO SB169 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nondisclosure of sensitive species information under the "Colorado Open Records Act".
Title
Sensitive Species Data And Public Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-169 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-169 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-25 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |