CO SB169 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning permitting youthful offenders to be housed in the same facility as inmates that mentor youthful offenders.
Title
Housing Mentors In Youthful Offender Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 20-169 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |