CO SB160 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain administrative clarifications to local government election codes.
Title
ModificationTo Local Government Election Codes
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Sen. Thomas Exum [D] |
Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D] | Rep. Brianna Titone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-160 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-160 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-29 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |