CO SB159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the passenger tramway safety board, and, in connection therewith, implementing some of the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Passenger Tramway Safety Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-159 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-15 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |