CO SB146 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that a freestanding emergency department inform a person who is seeking medical treatment about the health care options that are available to the person, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Freestanding Emergency Departments Required Consumer Notices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.010 [Attachment H] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C); (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.010 [Attachment H] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C); (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-146, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |