CO SB145 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the extension of the period of time that voluntary contributions that are set to expire in 2021 will appear on the state individual tax return form.
Title
Extending Expiring Tax Check-offs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-145 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Reconsideration (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-145 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-145 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Reconsideration (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-145 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |