CO SB143 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning credential assessment tools, and, in connection therewith, integrating frameworks for nondegree credential evaluation and classification into state education and workforce systems, aligning stackable credential pathways and apprenticeship programs with international classification standards, and making an appropriation.
Title
Credential Quality Apprenticeship Classification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-143 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-143 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-143, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-143, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-143 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-143 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-143, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-143, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |