CO SB141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the competitive solicitation method used by the statewide internet portal authority to contract for a statewide portal integrator.
Title
Statewide Internet Portal Authority Competitive Solicitation Method
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 21-141 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-141 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 21-141 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-141 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-31 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |