CO SB138 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study Delegating Division Motor Vehicle Functions
Title
Study Delegating Division Motor Vehicle Functions
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment with standard no appropriation clause The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment with standard no appropriation clause The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment with standard no appropriation clause The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment with standard no appropriation clause The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |