CO SB124 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Machine Tools Sales Tax Exempt Recovered Materials

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Machine Tools Sales Tax Exempt Recovered Materials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-124 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-124 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-08SenateGovernor Signed
2016-05-09SenateSent to the Governor
2016-05-09SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-05-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-04-14HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-03-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2016-03-16SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-15SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-03-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-02-16SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-02-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F/$FILE/124_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F/$FILE/124sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F/$FILE/124_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F/$FILE/124_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F/$FILE/124_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F/$FILE/124_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42D60A77DF04CCEC87257F2400644C4F/$FILE/124_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A3149674B5B20E8287257F5B0081D519
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A97024F328CBB44087257F7300537FA3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/95F3E1C3CF4B26B787257F7300534C10
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0DB89B5745ABC64887257F7300536F0D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/789305B069C51B9387257F78004DBDD6/$FILE/jour_064.pdf#437
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A3149674B5B20E8287257F5B0081D519
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0DB89B5745ABC64887257F7300536F0D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A97024F328CBB44087257F7300537FA3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/95F3E1C3CF4B26B787257F7300534C10
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B3AD91519DD2F3BC87257F950062B0F1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B3AD91519DD2F3BC87257F950062B0F1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/93ABA61E805E91D887257FA3005085C9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/A5A4B27BFFFF997D87257FA40059C73A/$FILE/Ap29.pdf#1121

Bill Comments 750

feedback