CO SB114 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Access To CSU Global Campus
Title
Student Access To CSU Global Campus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to refer SB14-114 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to refer SB14-114 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-114, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |