CO SB099 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provisional Physical Therapy License
Title
Provisional Physical Therapy License
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Hodge [D] | Rep. Jenise May [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend printed bill, page 2, line 16, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 6-0 with one member excused. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend printed bill, page 2, line 16, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 6-0 with one member excused. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend printed bill, page 2, line 16, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 6-0 with one member excused. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend printed bill, page 2, line 16, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 6-0 with one member excused. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-31 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-22 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2014-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |