CO SB097 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental Needs Trust For Certain PERA Benefits
Title
Supplemental Needs Trust For Certain PERA Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-097 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to include a no approps clause indicating within existing resources The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to include a no approps clause indicating within existing resources The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |