CO SB094 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the state board of pharmacy, and, in connection therewith, implementing recommendations contained in the 2020 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies and making other changes regarding the practice of professions regulated by the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Continue State Board Of Pharmacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-094 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-094 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-094, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-094, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-094, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-094, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-05-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-27HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-20HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2021-04-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2021-04-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-094
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_094_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_094_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_094_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_094_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_094_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_094_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB094_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB094_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB094_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB094_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB094_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB094_L.007.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb094_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0094_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb094_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0094_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d931cda3c3f752a8725869b0073741e-sb21-094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dbe463e97ad97b52872586c0004e8ebe-sb21-094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dbe463e97ad97b52872586c0004e8ebe-sb21-094-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-094vote559738
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d931cda3c3f752a8725869b0073741e-sb21-094-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d931cda3c3f752a8725869b0073741e-sb21-094-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d931cda3c3f752a8725869b0073741e-sb21-094-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0728ebb37752c9ad872586d3006e8ada-sb21-094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/94ff8cd735938fdb872586db006e84c0-sb21-094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0728ebb37752c9ad872586d3006e8ada-sb21-094-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4c544f4b29ed180c872586df00565c04-sb21-094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-094vote76b464
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-094vote70b768
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-094vote70c220

Bill Comments 750

feedback