CO SB093 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - House Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - House Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lien Rights During Foreclosure
Title
Lien Rights During Foreclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 10-093 indefinitely (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | House Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-15 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |