CO SB086 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of cyber coding cryptology for state records, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cyber Coding Cryptology For State Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.014) (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30 Governor Signed
2018-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-07SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 05/04/2018 - No Amendments
2018-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2018-04-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
2018-04-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-02-07SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-086
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_086_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_086_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_086_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_086_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_086_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_086_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-02-07t134437z-sb18-086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-02-07t134437z-sb18-086-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-02-07t134437z-sb18-086-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-02-07t134437z-sb18-086-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-03t083443z-sb18-086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-03t083443z-sb18-086-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-03t083443z-sb18-086-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-086vote54125f
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-04-26t134513z-sb18-086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-sb18-086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-04-26t134513z-sb18-086-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-04-26t134513z-sb18-086-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-04-26t134513z-sb18-086-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-04-26t134513z-sb18-086-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-086vote813b02
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-086vote810b9e
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-086vote812365
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-086vote0f19e5
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-086vote0f0e2e

Bill Comments

feedback